Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 298 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5698 Week
» 23750 Month
» 256670 Year
» 1922046 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2604 m/e 11/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9706 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69706 m/e 06/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 310
Works Number 1673
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1927
Withdrawal Sun 04/12/1960
Service Life 33 yrs, 1 mth , 3 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1927
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
NOR   Norwich Thorpe w/e 02/04/1949
32C   Lowestoft 4w/e 25/08/1956
32A   Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/10/1956
32C   Lowestoft 4w/e 15/06/1957
30A   Stratford w/e 12/09/1959
     Withdrawn on 04/12/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe w/e 02/04/1949
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 18/08/1956
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 13/10/1956
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 15/06/1957
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 03/10/1959
WDN   on 04/12/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1936 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2604
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1673
   
06/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9706    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69706    
02/04/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
25/08/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
20/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
15/06/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
12/09/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
04/12/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69706    

prev prev