Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 39 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4954 Week
» 16191 Month
» 249111 Year
» 1914487 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2606 m/e 12/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9708 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69708 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 310
Works Number 1675
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1927
Withdrawal Fri 13/01/1961
Service Life 33 yrs, 1 mth , 14 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1927
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
IPS   Ipswich w/e 09/10/1948
MEL     4w/e 25/12/1948
32A   Norwich Thorpe w/e 30/07/1950
32G   Melton Constable 4w/e 23/12/1950
32G   Melton Constable m/e 31/12/1950
32A   Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 20/10/1951
32D   Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 20/03/1954
30A   Stratford 4w/e 23/10/1954
32D   Yarmouth South Town 6w/e 25/12/1954
32C   Lowestoft 5w/e 20/07/1957
32D   Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 19/10/1957
30A   Stratford w/e 07/02/1959
30F   Parkeston Quay w/e 30/01/1960
30A   Stratford w/e 07/01/1961
     Withdrawn on 13/01/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IPS Ipswich w/e 09/10/1948
ALLOC MEL   4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 30/07/1950
ALLOC 32G Melton Constable m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 20/10/1951
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 5w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 18/09/1954
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 04/12/1954
ALLOC 32C Lowestoft 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 32D Yarmouth South Town 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   on 13/01/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1936 Condensers removed
01/1954 Push and Pull Fitted
01/1954 Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/07/1961 Stratford MPD (30A) (On shed withdrawn) On shed withdrawn: 64652, 67701/6/8/9/36, 68899, 69679/82/700/8. SLS/196109

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2606
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1675
   
06/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9708    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69708    
09/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS)    
25/12/1948 Allocation      
30/07/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G)    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
01/1954 Modification Modification: Push and Pull Fitted    
01/1954 Modification Modification: Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector    
20/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
23/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
25/12/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C)    
19/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D)    
07/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
07/01/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
13/01/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69708    

prev prev