Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 810 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14216 Week
» 67232 Month
» 186759 Year
» 3213612 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
2606 |
m/e |
12/1927 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9708 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
69708 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
A. Hill |
Class |
N7 |
Company History |
GER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Order Number |
310 |
Works Number |
1675 |
Fittings (as built) |
Condenser | Fitted | Engine Brakes | Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
To Service |
During 12/1927 |
Withdrawal |
Fri 13/01/1961 |
Service Life |
33 yrs, 1 mth , 14 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
06/1936 |
Condensers removed |
01/1954 |
Push/Pull equipment fitted |
01/1954 |
Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/07/1961 |
Stratford MPD (30A) (On shed withdrawn) |
On shed withdrawn: 64652, 67701/6/8/9/36, 68899, 69679/82/700/8. |
SLS/196109 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1927 |
To Service |
To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2606 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1675 |
|
|
06/1936 |
Modification |
Modification: Condensers removed |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9708 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69708 |
|
|
09/10/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS) |
|
|
25/12/1948 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
30/07/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
23/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
31/12/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Melton Constable (32G) |
|
|
20/10/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
01/1954 |
Modification |
Modification: Push/Pull equipment fitted |
|
|
01/1954 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brake with Vacuum Ejector |
|
|
20/03/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
25/12/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
19/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
07/02/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
30/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
07/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
13/01/1961 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69708 |
|
|