Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 878 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1952 Week
» 27313 Month
» 260233 Year
» 1925609 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2607 m/e 12/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9709 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69709 m/e 08/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 310
Works Number 1676
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1927
Withdrawal Tue 01/11/1960
Service Life 32 yrs, 11 mths , 2 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1927
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
NOR   Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 26/03/1949
34C   Hatfield 4w/e 16/05/1953
30E   Colchester 5w/e 20/07/1957
30A   Stratford 4w/e 19/10/1957
     Withdrawn on 01/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NOR Norwich Thorpe 4w/e 26/03/1949
ALLOC 34C Hatfield 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 13/07/1957
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 05/10/1957
WDN   on 01/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
10/1936 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2607
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1676
   
10/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9709    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
08/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69709    
26/03/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NOR)    
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hatfield (34C)    
20/07/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
19/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
01/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69709    

prev prev