Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 843 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1917 Week
» 27278 Month
» 260198 Year
» 1925574 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2609 m/e 12/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9711 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 69711 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 310
Works Number 1678
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1927
Withdrawal Mon 23/11/1959
Service Life 31 yrs, 11 mths , 24 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1927
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
IPS   Ipswich w/e 28/05/1949
STR   Stratford w/e 04/06/1949
30E   Colchester 3w/e 31/05/1950
30E   Colchester m/e 30/06/1950
32B   Ipswich w/e 20/08/1950
30A   Stratford on 24/09/1950
31C   Kings Lynn w/e 08/10/1950
31C   Kings Lynn 4w/e 21/10/1950
30A   Stratford on 29/10/1950
30A   Stratford 4w/e 25/11/1950
     Withdrawn on 23/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IPS Ipswich w/e 28/05/1949
ALLOC STR Stratford w/e 04/06/1949
ALLOC 30E Colchester m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 32B Ipswich w/e 20/08/1950
ALLOC 30A Stratford on 24/09/1950
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 30A Stratford on 29/10/1950
WDN   on 23/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1937 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2609
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1678
   
12/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9711    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
28/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS)    
04/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (STR)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69711    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
30/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
20/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
24/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
08/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
29/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69711    

prev prev