Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 827 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1901 Week
» 27262 Month
» 260182 Year
» 1925558 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2610 m/e 12/1927
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9712 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69712 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 311
Works Number 1679
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1927
Withdrawal Sun 04/12/1960
Service Life 33 yrs , 4 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1927
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BOS   Boston w/e 03/12/1949
30A   Stratford w/e 23/04/1950
30A   Stratford m/e 06/05/1950
31C   Kings Lynn w/e 08/10/1950
31C   Kings Lynn 4w/e 21/10/1950
30A   Stratford on 29/10/1950
30A   Stratford 4w/e 25/11/1950
     Withdrawn on 04/12/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BOS Boston w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 23/04/1950
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 30A Stratford on 29/10/1950
WDN   on 04/12/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1937 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1927 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2610
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1679
   
04/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9712    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69712    
03/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (BOS)    
23/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
06/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
08/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
29/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
04/12/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69712    

prev prev