Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 39 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4954 Week
» 16191 Month
» 249111 Year
» 1914487 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2611 m/e 01/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9713 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 69713 m/e 04/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 311
Works Number 1680
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 01/1928
Withdrawal Sun 10/09/1961
Service Life 33 yrs, 8 mths , 10 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1928
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 10/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 10/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1937 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
12/08/1957 Bishops Stortford No transfers are recorded between Stratford and this shed (30C), its allocation at present being 65535/6, 67701/11/3/21/2/3, 69676, 69713. N7 69676 replaced 67738 which went to Lowestoft. SLS/195709
30/04/1961 Stratford Works (Old Works Yard) New Erecting Shop: D204, D5041/3/72/95, D5515/6/62, D5625, D5907, D8216, D8403/8. Outside New Erecting Shop: D206, D5050/1, D5588, D5634, D5905. Old Works: 43105, 64697, 65460/2, 67716, 69646, 69730. Old Works Yard: 65465, 67701, 68538, 69713. Scrap Road: 68578, 69656, Works Shunters : DEPT32/44/5. SLS/196106

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2611
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1680
   
01/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9713    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69713    
10/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69713    

prev prev