|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
02/04/1959 | Stratford Works (Waiting cut up) | Old Works, 43143 (40F), 61009 (40A), 61116 (14D), 61202 (40A), 61232 (30F), 61329 (30A), 61348 (31F), 61371 (31A), 61405 (40A), 64823 (40F), 69696 (30A). Diesel Sp., D206 (34B), 11138 (30F), 12078 (1A), 15203 (75C), D2550 (32B), D3094 (75A), D3301 (30A), D5304 (34B), D8404 (30A). Waiting Wks., 61575 (31A), 64650 (30E), 64677 (30A), 64715 (40E), 65556 (31A), 69637 (34C), 69669 (30A). Paint shop, 15215 (75C), 61375 (30A), Stripping Sp., 43105 (30A), 61573 Wdn, 69728 (30A). Foundry, 68541. Waiting cut up, 61566/76/80, 62536/82/8, 64651, 65467, 65574, 68574/638, 69600/10/6/9/23/7/34/5/59/66/76/716/31. | SLS/195905 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1928 | To Service | To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2614 Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1683 |
||
08/1936 | Modification | Modification: Condensers removed | ||
10/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9716 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR) | ||
09/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69716 | ||
03/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Boston (BOS) | ||
14/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
31/05/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
08/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) | ||
21/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C) | ||
29/10/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
25/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
12/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (30E) | ||
19/07/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colchester (30E) | ||
04/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
18/10/1952 | Allocation | Reallocated to Stratford (30A) | ||
12/02/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69716 |