Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 259 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5659 Week
» 23711 Month
» 256631 Year
» 1922007 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2614 m/e 02/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9716 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69716 m/e 09/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 311
Works Number 1683
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 02/1928
Withdrawal Thu 12/02/1959
Service Life 31 yrs , 12 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1928
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BOS   Boston w/e 03/12/1949
30A   Stratford w/e 14/05/1950
30A   Stratford 3w/e 31/05/1950
31C   Kings Lynn w/e 08/10/1950
31C   Kings Lynn 4w/e 21/10/1950
30A   Stratford on 29/10/1950
30A   Stratford 4w/e 25/11/1950
30E   Colchester 4w/e 12/07/1952
30E   Colchester 4w/e 19/07/1952
30A   Stratford 4w/e 04/10/1952
30A   Stratford 4w/e 18/10/1952
     Withdrawn on 12/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BOS Boston w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 14/05/1950
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 30A Stratford on 29/10/1950
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 04/10/1952
WDN   on 12/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1936 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/04/1959 Stratford Works (Waiting cut up) Old Works, 43143 (40F), 61009 (40A), 61116 (14D), 61202 (40A), 61232 (30F), 61329 (30A), 61348 (31F), 61371 (31A), 61405 (40A), 64823 (40F), 69696 (30A). Diesel Sp., D206 (34B), 11138 (30F), 12078 (1A), 15203 (75C), D2550 (32B), D3094 (75A), D3301 (30A), D5304 (34B), D8404 (30A). Waiting Wks., 61575 (31A), 64650 (30E), 64677 (30A), 64715 (40E), 65556 (31A), 69637 (34C), 69669 (30A). Paint shop, 15215 (75C), 61375 (30A), Stripping Sp., 43105 (30A), 61573 Wdn, 69728 (30A). Foundry, 68541. Waiting cut up, 61566/76/80, 62536/82/8, 64651, 65467, 65574, 68574/638, 69600/10/6/9/23/7/34/5/59/66/76/716/31. SLS/195905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2614
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1683
   
08/1936 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9716    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
09/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69716    
03/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (BOS)    
14/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
08/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
29/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
12/02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69716    

prev prev