Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 256 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5656 Week
» 23708 Month
» 256628 Year
» 1922004 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2615 m/e 02/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9717 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69717 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 311
Works Number 1684
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 02/1928
Withdrawal Thu 01/01/1959
Service Life 30 yrs, 11 mths , 1 dy

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1928
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
IPS   Ipswich w/e 04/06/1949
IPS   Ipswich m/e 07/1949
30A   Stratford w/e 14/05/1950
30A   Stratford 3w/e 31/05/1950
30E   Colchester w/e 07/07/1951
30E   Colchester 4w/e 21/07/1951
30A   Stratford w/e 29/09/1951
30A   Stratford 4w/e 20/10/1951
30E   Colchester w/e 17/11/1951
30A   Stratford 4w/e 04/10/1952
30A   Stratford 4w/e 18/10/1952
     Withdrawn on 01/01/1959
51L   Thornaby w/e 07/10/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC IPS Ipswich w/e 04/06/1949
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 14/05/1950
ALLOC 30E Colchester w/e 07/07/1951
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 30E Colchester w/e 17/11/1951
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 04/10/1952
WDN   on 01/01/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
03/1937 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1958 Stratford Works (Waiting Wks.) Old Works-61003 (30F), 43107 (31D), 61066 (31A), 61089 (30A), 61136 (14D), 61160 (32B), 61164 (30A), 61254 (32B), 61299 (40E), 61361 (30E), 61372 (30A), 61632 (31A), 64677 (30A), 64965 (33A), 65561 (32B), 69695-Wdn., 80079 (33B). Diesel Shop-12064 (14A), 15214 (75C), D208 (34B), D2208 (30A), D2210 (32A), D2214 (32A), D3221 (75C), D3444 (34A), D3460 (73C), D3476 (34C), D5514 (30A), D8407 (30A). Waiting Wks.-61336 (30E), 61573 (31E), 61576 (31E), 62571 (40A), 62582 (31A), 62610 (31C), 64651 (30E), 64672 (31B), 64688 (31A), 68625 (32D), 68630 (30A), 68636 (30A), 69610 (30A), 69616 (31A), 69703 (30A), 69717 (30A), Departmental 36. Stripping-62614, 69608/41. Foundry-65568, 65587, 69624. On Shed Ex Wks.-D2573 (32G), D3217 (75A). Waiting Cut Up-61547/61/4, 62518/34/6/43/5/66/72/88/615, 62788, 64645, 65390/438/41/4, 65504/74, 68529/41/616/8/32, 68653/7/9/62/6, 69628. SLS/195902

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2615
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1684
   
03/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9717    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
04/06/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS)    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS)    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69717    
14/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
07/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
29/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
17/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
01/01/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69717    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    

prev prev