Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 277 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5677 Week
» 23729 Month
» 256649 Year
» 1922025 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2616 m/e 02/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9718 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69718 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 311
Works Number 1685
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 02/1928
Withdrawal Sun 04/12/1960
Service Life 32 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1928
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
31C   Kings Lynn w/e 01/08/1959
30A   Stratford w/e 15/08/1959
     Withdrawn on 04/12/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 31C Kings Lynn 4w/e 08/08/1959
ALLOC 80A   4w/e 05/09/1959
WDN   on 04/12/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1937 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2616
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1685
   
05/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9718    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69718    
01/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Kings Lynn (31C)    
15/08/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
04/12/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69718    

prev prev