Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 41 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4956 Week
» 16193 Month
» 249113 Year
» 1914489 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2617 m/e 03/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9719 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69719 m/e 11/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 311
Works Number 1686
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 03/1928
Withdrawal Thu 24/11/1960
Service Life 32 yrs, 8 mths , 26 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1928
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
IPS   Ipswich m/e 07/1949
30A   Stratford w/e 14/05/1950
30A   Stratford 3w/e 31/05/1950
30E   Colchester 4w/e 12/07/1952
30E   Colchester 4w/e 19/07/1952
30A   Stratford 4w/e 04/10/1952
30A   Stratford 4w/e 18/10/1952
30E   Colchester 4w/e 01/11/1952
30E   Colchester 4w/e 15/11/1952
30A   Stratford 4w/e 21/11/1953
     Withdrawn on 24/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 14/05/1950
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 04/10/1952
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 01/11/1952
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 28/11/1953
WDN   on 24/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1937 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1950 Unreported renumberings The following locos have been reported as renumberd by observations, but whose changes have not been notified by the Eastern and North Eastern regions: 69353, 69674, 69719, 63719, 63951/4/5/6, an 69012/3; the latter pair of 'J.72's' were delivered in the 60000 series! SLS/195007

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2617
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1686
   
01/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9719    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
11/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69719    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (IPS)    
14/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
19/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
04/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
18/10/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
01/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
15/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
21/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
24/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69719    

prev prev