Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 236 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5636 Week
» 23688 Month
» 256608 Year
» 1921984 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2618 m/e 04/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9720 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 69720 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 311
Works Number 1687
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 04/1928
Withdrawal Tue 01/11/1960
Service Life 32 yrs, 7 mths , 1 dy

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1928
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30E   Colchester 4w/e 21/07/1951
30E   Colchester 3w/e 28/07/1951
30A   Stratford 4w/e 19/02/1955
30E   Colchester 3w/e 14/05/1955
30A   Stratford 4w/e 22/09/1956
     Withdrawn on 01/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30E Colchester 3w/e 28/07/1951
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 26/02/1955
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 21/05/1955
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 13/10/1956
WDN   on 01/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1937 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2618
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1687
   
06/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9720    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69720    
21/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
28/07/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
19/02/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
14/05/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
22/09/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
01/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69720    

prev prev