Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 294 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5694 Week
» 23746 Month
» 256666 Year
» 1922042 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2625 m/e 09/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9727 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69727 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 312
Works Number 1697
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 09/1928
Withdrawal Thu 24/11/1960
Service Life 32 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1928
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
BOS   Boston w/e 03/12/1949
30A   Stratford w/e 14/05/1950
30A   Stratford 3w/e 31/05/1950
30F   Parkeston Quay 4w/e 17/11/1956
30E   Colchester 4w/e 16/02/1957
30A   Stratford w/e 16/05/1959
     Withdrawn on 24/11/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC BOS Boston w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 30A Stratford w/e 14/05/1950
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 10/11/1956
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 16/05/1959
WDN   on 24/11/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
06/1937 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2625
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1697
   
06/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9727    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69727    
03/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Boston (BOS)    
14/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
31/05/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
16/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
16/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
24/11/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69727    

prev prev