Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 310 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 5710 Week
» 23762 Month
» 256682 Year
» 1922058 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2628 m/e 11/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9730 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 69730 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 312
Works Number 1701
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 11/1928
Withdrawal Sun 10/09/1961
Service Life 32 yrs, 10 mths , 10 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1928
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30F   Parkeston Quay w/e 05/12/1959
30A   Stratford w/e 30/01/1960
30F   Parkeston Quay w/e 30/07/1960
30A   Stratford w/e 22/10/1960
     Withdrawn on 10/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 26/12/1959
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 20/02/1960
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 5w/e 06/08/1960
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   on 10/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1937 Condensers removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/04/1961 Stratford Works (Old Works) New Erecting Shop: D204, D5041/3/72/95, D5515/6/62, D5625, D5907, D8216, D8403/8. Outside New Erecting Shop: D206, D5050/1, D5588, D5634, D5905. Old Works: 43105, 64697, 65460/2, 67716, 69646, 69730. Old Works Yard: 65465, 67701, 68538, 69713. Scrap Road: 68578, 69656, Works Shunters : DEPT32/44/5. SLS/196106

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2628
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1701
   
07/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9730    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69730    
05/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
30/07/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69730    

prev prev