Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 42 Today
» 938 Yesterday
» 4957 Week
» 16194 Month
» 249114 Year
» 1914490 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2630 m/e 12/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9732 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69732 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 313
Works Number 1704
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1928
Withdrawal Sun 10/09/1961
Service Life 32 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1928
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30E   Colchester 4w/e 21/11/1953
30F   Parkeston Quay w/e 07/11/1959
30A   Stratford w/e 30/01/1960
     Withdrawn on 10/09/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 28/11/1953
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 20/02/1960
WDN   on 10/09/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
07/1937 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2630
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1704
   
07/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9732    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69732    
21/11/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
30/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
10/09/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69732    

prev prev