Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 839 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1913 Week
» 27274 Month
» 260194 Year
» 1925570 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2631 m/e 12/1928
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9733 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 69733 m/e 07/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer A. Hill
Class N7
Company History GER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Doncaster Works
Order Number 313
Works Number 1706
Fittings (as built)
Condenser Fitted
Engine Brakes Westinghouse brake with Vacuum Ejector
To Service During 12/1928
Withdrawal Mon 17/10/1960
Service Life 31 yrs, 10 mths , 17 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1928
STR   Stratford on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
30F   Parkeston Quay 4w/e 17/11/1956
30E   Colchester 4w/e 16/02/1957
30A   Stratford w/e 07/11/1959
     Withdrawn on 17/10/1960

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 30F Parkeston Quay 4w/e 10/11/1956
ALLOC 30E Colchester 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 28/11/1959
WDN   on 17/10/1960

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1937 Condensers removed


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1928 To Service To service as London and North Eastern Railway Number 2631
Built at Doncaster Works, Works Number 1706
   
08/1937 Modification Modification: Condensers removed    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9733    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Stratford (STR)    
07/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69733    
17/11/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F)    
16/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
17/10/1960 Withdrawn Condemned as 69733    

prev