Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 58 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5533 Week
» 5533 Month
» 72395 Year
» 1737771 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 9 m/e 01/1888
North Eastern Railway 503 on 01/01/1914
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9374 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 69374 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N8
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N801/1888
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gateshead Works
To Service During 01/1888
Withdrawal During 03/1949
Service Life 61 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 01/1888
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn m/e 03/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN HLD Hull Dairycoates on 28/03/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. SLS/194905

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1888 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 9
Built at Gateshead Works
   
01/01/1914 Renumbered Renumbered to 503    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9374    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 69374 but not taken up    
03/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 9374    

prev