Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 71 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5546 Week
» 5546 Month
» 72408 Year
» 1737784 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 855 m/e 10/1888
London and North Eastern Railway (Replace) 856 m/e 03/1939 (Replaced original 856 due to the latter being scrapped in error.)
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9376 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69376 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N8
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N810/1888
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 10/1888
Withdrawal During 02/1950
Service Life 61 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1888
     Withdrawn m/e 12/1938
91NE   (Reinstated) m/e 03/1939
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
NEV   Neville Hill w/e 21/08/1948
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 23/10/1948
     Withdrawn m/e 02/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 21/08/1948
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 23/10/1948
WDN HLD Hull Dairycoates on 27/02/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/02/1948 Darlington Works New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) SLS/194804

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1888 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 855
Built at Darlington Works
   
03/1939 Reinstated      
03/1939 Renumbered Renumbered to 856    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9376    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
21/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
23/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 69376 but not taken up    
02/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 9376