Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 104 Today
» 1070 Yesterday
» 104 Week
» 104 Month
» 66966 Year
» 1732342 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 861 m/e 10/1888
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9378 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69378 m/e 12/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N8
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N811/1888
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gateshead Works
To Service During 11/1888
Withdrawal Mon 26/09/1955
Service Life 66 yrs, 10 mths , 26 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1888
TDK   Tyne Dock on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
52B   Heaton w/e 17/11/1951
53C   Hull Springhead 4w/e 24/10/1953
53D   Bridlington 4w/e 19/12/1953
     Withdrawn on 26/09/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 52B Heaton w/e 17/11/1951
ALLOC 53C Hull Springhead 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 53D Bridlington 4w/e 26/12/1953
WDN   on 26/09/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1888 Renumbered Renumbered to 861    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9378    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tyne Dock (TDK)    
17/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Heaton (52B)    
12/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 69378    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Springhead (53C)    
19/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Bridlington (53D)    
26/09/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69378    

prev