Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 92 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2257 Week
» 2257 Month
» 69119 Year
» 1734495 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 863 m/e 10/1888
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9380 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69380 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N8
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N811/1888
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Gateshead Works
To Service During 11/1888
Withdrawal Sat 25/11/1950
Service Life 62 yrs , 25 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1888
HTN   Heaton on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 25/11/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HTN Heaton w/e 20/12/1947
WDN   on 20/11/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1888 Renumbered Renumbered to 863    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9380    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Heaton (HTN)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 69380 but not taken up    
25/11/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 9380