Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 101 Today
» 1070 Yesterday
» 101 Week
» 101 Month
» 66963 Year
» 1732339 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1152 m/e 12/1888
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9385 on 03/03/1946
British Railways 69385 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N8
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N804/1889
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 04/1889
Withdrawal w/e Wed 27/10/1954
Service Life 65 yrs, 6 mths , 26 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1889
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn w/e 27/10/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 27/10/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1954 Darlington Works Darlington Works have completed Class '2' B.R. engines up to No. 78039 and withdrawal of old N.E.R. types has speeded up recently. Nos. 69770, 69385, 68258, 68292 (this engine had the extra hanging buffers for shunting the old cauldron wagons long since gone), 68304, 65661/7/86/705/10, and 62358/71/4/80/89. 62371 is of note as she is one of the 1942 rebuilt class''D20' engines, and also, in her early N.E. days as No. 592 she was stationed at Edinburgh, for working the East Coast trains to Newcastle, with Driver John Graham, who was later promoted to Night Running Foreman at Bank Top, Darlington. One thing peculiar to this engine was the absence of brass beading on the splasher above the rear driving wheels, which gave her an odd look. SLS/195412

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1888 Renumbered Renumbered to 1152    
03/03/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9385    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69385    
27/10/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 69385    

prev