Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 942 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 5288 Week
» 5288 Month
» 72150 Year
» 1737526 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 961 m/e 11/1889
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9398 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69398 m/e 01/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N8
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N804/1890
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
To Service During 04/1890
Withdrawal Mon 15/10/1951
Service Life 61 yrs, 6 mths , 14 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1890
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
NEV   Neville Hill w/e 21/08/1948
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 23/10/1948
     Withdrawn on 15/10/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill w/e 21/08/1948
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 23/10/1948
WDN   on 15/10/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1889 Renumbered Renumbered to 961    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9398    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
21/08/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV)    
23/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
01/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69398    
15/10/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 69398    

prev