Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 312 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4289 Week
» 15526 Month
» 248446 Year
» 1913822 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 69410   Not applied
North Eastern Railway 1617 m/e 05/1893
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9410 on 03/02/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N9
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N905/1893
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 05/1893
Withdrawal During 10/1950
Service Life 57 yrs , 5 mths

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1893
HLS   Hull Springhead by 01/01/1923 (Snapshot)
TDK   Tyne Dock on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn m/e 10/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TDK Tyne Dock w/e 08/11/1947
WDN 54B Tyne Dock on 19/10/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Number Allocated Allocated number 69410 but not taken up    
05/1893 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1617
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/01/1923 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Springhead (HLS)    
03/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9410    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Tyne Dock (TDK)    
10/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 9410    

prev