Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 284 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4261 Week
» 15498 Month
» 248418 Year
» 1913794 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
British Railways 69422   Not applied
North Eastern Railway 1650 m/e 11/1893
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9422 m/e 10/1946

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N9
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N911/1893
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 11/1893
Withdrawal During 04/1950
Service Life 56 yrs , 5 mths

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1893
HLS   Hull Springhead by 01/01/1923 (Snapshot)
AUK   West Auckland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
SUN   Sunderland w/e 10/01/1948
AUK   West Auckland w/e 17/01/1948
CON   Consett w/e 03/12/1949
     Withdrawn m/e 04/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC SUN Sunderland w/e 10/01/1948
ALLOC AUK West Auckland w/e 17/01/1948
ALLOC CON Consett w/e 03/12/1949
WDN 54D Consett on 28/04/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/02/1948 Darlington Works On 7/2 new 'L.1's' up to No. 9006 were complete and painted in North Road yard, Nos. 9001/2 are Darlington 2020/1 of 1948. Nos. 9001-3 are painted green and lettered L.N.E.R., while 9004 and upwards have 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and the numbers on the bunkers; it is understood that they will be fitted with electric light and Westinghouse brakes. Nos. 9001/2 are at present working from Darlington on Saltburn turns. 'B.1' No. 1062 has been painted green and it is understood that 'B.1's' as they come in for shops will be dealt with in a similar manner. Locomotives awaiting Shops or scrapping during January included: 819, 958, 1881, 2111/2, 2361, 2713/8, 2939/41, 3124, 3252, 3339, 3404, 4756, 4860, 5030/44/98, 5639/45/46, 5769, 5804/31/49/78, 7266/74, 7608/43, 8308, 8402, 8725/27, 9379/86, 9422, 9775 an 9835, and Rail Cars Recovery and Hope. Locomotives ex Shops included: Nos. 1068, 1466, 2354/60/74/95, 3408/39/60, 5037, 5705/13/36/73, 7309/21, 7625/57, 8230/98, 8304, 8702/48, 9117, 9431, 9778/95/99, 9835/39/41/79/86/90. It is believed that the first two locomotives to be painted here with the words 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to have the number prefixed with an 'E' were Nos. E5696 and E5663, during W/E 31/1; all locomotives off North Road are now appearing in a similar manner. 'B.1's' Nos. 1273-6 have arrived at Bank Top shed, the first lot of a further ten to be allocated here; these will replace 'J.39's' which are going elsewhere SLS/194803

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
0000 Number Allocated Allocated number 69422 but not taken up    
11/1893 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1650
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/01/1923 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Springhead (HLS)    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9422    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - West Auckland (AUK)    
10/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (SUN)    
17/01/1948 Allocation Reallocated to West Auckland (AUK)    
03/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Consett (CON)    
04/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 9422    

prev prev