Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 187 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3219 Week
» 21271 Month
» 254191 Year
» 1919567 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1654 m/e 12/1893
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9426 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69426 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N9
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N912/1893
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 12/1893
Withdrawal w/e Mon 23/02/1953
Service Life 59 yrs, 2 mths , 24 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1893
AUK   West Auckland by 01/01/1923 (Snapshot)
DAR   Darlington on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
54A   Sunderland w/e 04/02/1951
54A   Sunderland 4w/e 17/02/1951
54B   Tyne Dock w/e 17/11/1951
     Withdrawn w/e 23/02/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 54A Sunderland w/e 04/02/1951
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock w/e 17/11/1951
WDN   w/e 23/02/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
by 1923 Westinghouse Brake fitted
03/1930 Vacuum Ejector fitted
06/1946 Steam Brake fitted
06/1946 Westinghouse Brake removed
01/1949 Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1893 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1654
Built at Darlington Works
   
1923 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted    
01/01/1923 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - West Auckland (AUK)    
03/1930 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
06/1946 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
06/1946 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9426    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Darlington (DAR)    
01/1949 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69426    
04/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
17/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (54A)    
17/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
23/02/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 69426    

prev prev