Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 278 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4255 Week
» 15492 Month
» 248412 Year
» 1913788 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1705 m/e 02/1894
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9429 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69429 m/e 03/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Worsdell
Class N9
Company History NER/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N902/1894
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
Order Number No Order ID issued
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Steam
To Service During 02/1894
Withdrawal Mon 04/07/1955
Service Life 61 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1894
EHL   East Hartlepool by 01/01/1923 (Snapshot)
SUN   Sunderland on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
TDK   Tyne Dock w/e 09/04/1949
     Withdrawn on 04/07/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC TDK Tyne Dock w/e 09/04/1949
WDN   on 04/07/1955

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
by 1923 Westinghouse Brake fitted
04/1930 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1946 General At this date (30/11/1946) only the following Scottish Area engines still require to be renumbered: 4488, 4491, 2745, 4819, 4891, 4898, 3658, 3682, 3692, 1996, 9765, 6897, 3057, 9499, 9886, 9384, 6398, 6399, 6401, 265, 320, 9201, 9204, 9368, 9255, 9263, 9429, 9046, 2980, 9632, 9644, 9668, 9757, 9790, 7348, 9524, 9527; a total of 37, or 3 per cent. of the total stock SLS/194701

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1894 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1705
Built at Darlington Works
   
1923 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake fitted    
01/01/1923 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - East Hartlepool (EHL)    
04/1930 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9429    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Sunderland (SUN)    
09/04/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (TDK)    
03/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 69429    
04/07/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 69429    

prev