Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 794 Today
» 779 Yesterday
» 4909 Week
» 13024 Month
» 140467 Year
» 1805843 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1697 m/e 11/1902
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9093 m/e 05/1946
British Railways 69093 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class N10
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 11/1902
Withdrawal Mon 23/12/1957
Service Life 55 yrs, 1 mth , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1958

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1902
GHD   Gateshead on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 24/09/1949
54B   Tyne Dock 5w/e 23/07/1955
     Withdrawn on 23/12/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 24/09/1949
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 16/07/1955
WDN   on 23/12/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1930 Vacuum Ejector fitted
02/1939 Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted
12/1945 Vacuum Ejector removed
12/1945 Steam Brake fitted
12/1945 Westinghouse Brake removed
03/1949 Saturated LNER Diagram 67 Boiler Fitted
12/1951 Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1902 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1697
Built at Darlington Works
   
05/1930 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
02/1939 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted    
12/1945 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
12/1945 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed    
12/1945 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
05/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9093    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
03/1949 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67 Boiler Fitted    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69093    
24/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
12/1951 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
23/12/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 69093    
01/1958 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev