Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 780 Today
» 779 Yesterday
» 4895 Week
» 13010 Month
» 140453 Year
» 1805829 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1774 m/e 11/1902
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9094 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69094 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class N10
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 11/1902
Withdrawal Mon 01/07/1957
Service Life 54 yrs, 8 mths , 0 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1957

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1902
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 01/07/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 20/12/1947
WDN   on 01/07/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted
01/1944 Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted
09/1946 Steam Brake fitted
09/1946 Westinghouse Brake removed
09/1946 Vacuum Ejector removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1954 York Area The Holbeck (20A) turn to Scarborough mentioned in last month's notes has brought most of the Stanier Class 5 4-6-0's from Holbeck into York on various occasions; 73045 also appears frequently. 44810 (21A) appeared on it on 6/3/54. 44780 (25B) was under repair in York shed on 12/2/54. 61131 (37A) worked the 9.22 a.m. York to King's Cross as far as Doncaster on 12/2/54 instead of the customary Doncaster A3 or V2. 61131 returned to York at 1.26 p.m. on the 7.20 a.m. from Colchester. This latter train is normally hauled by a Doncaster B1, although V2's from New England are occasionally used instead. Two Scottish Region A3's called at York shed recently, returning north after overhaul at Doncaster Works, namely 60100 (64B) on 19/2/54 and 60095 (68E) on 3/3/54. 46465 (31A) was at York shed on 12/3/54, returning, to Cambridge after overhaul at Darlington Works. On 24/2/54 90145 (40B) arrived at York from the Hull via Market Weighton line hauling 69094 (53A) for Darlington Works. 67739 (32B) was also at York shed on the same date en route for Darlington Works in a very dilapidated condition.
Pantomime excursions to Leeds were run on 2/3/54 from both Scarborough and Kirbymoorside. One of the two Scarborough trains called at Weaverthorpe, Rillington, Strensall and Haxby stations, which have been closed to regular passenger traffic for many years. The excursion from Kirbymoorside called at Nawton, Helmsley, Gilling and Coxwold (closed early in 1953).
SLS/195404

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1902 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1774
Built at Darlington Works
   
05/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
01/1944 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted    
09/1946 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
09/1946 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed    
09/1946 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9094    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69094    
01/07/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 69094    
08/1957 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev