Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 25 Online
» 1564 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25195 Week
» 90149 Month
» 292813 Year
» 3319666 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North Eastern Railway |
89 |
m/e |
12/1902 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9095 |
m/e |
08/1946 |
British Railways |
69095 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
W. Worsdell |
Class |
N10 |
Company History |
NER/LNER |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Darlington Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Engine Brakes | Westinghouse |
|
To Service |
During 12/1902 |
Withdrawal |
Tue 25/10/1955 |
Service Life |
52 yrs, 10 mths , 25 dys |
Disposal
Scrapping |
During 11/1955 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
12/1902 |
BLA |
|
Blaydon |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
52A |
|
Gateshead |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
52A |
|
Gateshead |
4w/e |
19/07/1952 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
25/10/1955 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
52A |
Gateshead |
4w/e |
12/07/1952 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
25/10/1955 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
08/1929 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
09/1943 |
Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted |
11/1947 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
11/1947 |
Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1902 |
To Service |
To service as North Eastern Railway Number 89 Built at Darlington Works |
|
|
08/1929 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
09/1943 |
Modification |
Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted |
|
|
08/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9095 |
|
|
11/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/1947 |
Modification |
Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Blaydon (BLA) |
|
|
10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69095 |
|
|
12/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
19/07/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
25/10/1955 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69095 |
|
|
11/1955 |
Scrapped |
Scrapped |
|
|