Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 782 Today
» 779 Yesterday
» 4897 Week
» 13012 Month
» 140455 Year
» 1805831 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1109 m/e 12/1902
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9097 on 10/02/1946
British Railways 69097 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class N10
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 12/1902
Withdrawal Mon 09/04/1962
Service Life 59 yrs, 4 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1962

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1902
GHD   Gateshead on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 09/04/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 09/04/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1930 Vacuum Ejector fitted
03/1941 Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted
09/1944 Steam Brake fitted
09/1944 Westinghouse Brake removed
09/1944 Vacuum Ejector removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/02/1948 Darlington Works New 'L.1's' are completed up to No. 9010. No. 9001 has returned to N.Rd with a damaged buffer beam. Nos. 9002-9006 are still working from Darlington and Nos. 9007-9010 have not yet been handed over to the shed. Nos. 9004/5 are Darlington 2023/4 of 1948, both bearing a January paint date. Locomotives for shops during February included Nos. 510, 804, 822, 2933, 2937, 2993, 3279, 3298, 3375, 3420, 4756, 5063, 5612, 5691, 5878, 7266, 7604, 7608, 8235, 8248, 8250, 8273, 8277, 8427, 8730, 9419, 9834, 9838 an 9875. Of these Nos. 3279, 5063 and 9419 are in the scrap yard, No. 9419 being cut up at the end of February. Locomotives ex shops during February included Nos. 937, 1069, 2354, 2382, 2386, 2982, 3260, 3370, 3373, 3374, 5645, 5646, 5663, 5716, 5769, 5805, 7243, 7334, 8230, 8272, 8310, 8402, 8433, 8727, 8729, 8748, 9097, 9118, 9376 an 9780. 'B.1' No. 1069 is painted green and lettered 'British Railways' as No. 1289 (NBL 26190/47) SLS/194804
30/04/1962 N10 0-6-2T\'s extinct The Worsdell ex-N.E.R. Class N10 0-6-2Ts became extinct when 69097, 69101 an 69109 of Bowes Bridge, sub to Gateshead (52A) were simultaneously condemned during April. Built as N.E.R. Class U. the twenty locos ultimately became L.N.E.R. Class N10. All passed into B.R. at Nationalisation and withdrawals began with L.N.E.R. 9103 in November, 1948. SLS/196210
14/07/1962 Darlington Works (Scrap Yard) Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1902 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1109
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1930 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
03/1941 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted    
09/1944 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
09/1944 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed    
09/1944 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
10/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9097    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69097    
09/04/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 69097    
08/1962 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev