Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 216 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3248 Week
» 21300 Month
» 254220 Year
» 1919596 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1112 m/e 10/1902
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9098 on 17/02/1946
British Railways 69098 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class N10
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 10/1902
Withdrawal Tue 24/09/1957
Service Life 54 yrs, 11 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1957

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1902
HLD   Hull Dairycoates on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
50B   Neville Hill 5w/e 22/01/1955
     Withdrawn on 24/09/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 20/12/1947
ALLOC 50B Neville Hill 4w/e 29/01/1955
WDN   on 24/09/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted
06/1946 Steam Brake fitted
06/1946 Westinghouse Brake removed
06/1946 Vacuum Ejector removed
06/1946 Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1902 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1112
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
17/02/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9098    
06/1946 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted    
06/1946 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
06/1946 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed    
06/1946 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69098    
22/01/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Neville Hill (50B)    
24/09/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 69098    
10/1957 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev