Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 67 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4413 Week
» 4413 Month
» 71275 Year
» 1736651 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1138 m/e 10/1902
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9100 on 27/01/1946
British Railways 69100 on 25/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class N10
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 10/1902
Withdrawal Mon 25/11/1957
Service Life 55 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1958

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1902
GHD   Gateshead on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 25/11/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   on 25/11/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
08/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted
01/1947 Vacuum Ejector removed
01/1947 Steam Brake fitted
01/1947 Westinghouse Brake removed
11/1950 Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted
05/1954 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1902 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1138
Built at Darlington Works
   
08/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
27/01/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9100    
01/1947 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
01/1947 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed    
01/1947 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
11/1950 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted    
25/11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69100    
05/1954 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
25/11/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 69100    
01/1958 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev