Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 176 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 6802 Week
» 31636 Month
» 65968 Year
» 1731344 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1317 m/e 12/1902
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9102 m/e 04/1946
British Railways 69102 m/e 12/1948

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class N10
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 12/1902
Withdrawal Mon 09/02/1959
Service Life 56 yrs, 2 mths , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1959

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1902
GHD   Gateshead on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 24/09/1949
54B   Tyne Dock 5w/e 23/07/1955
52A   Gateshead 4w/e 14/12/1957
     Withdrawn on 09/02/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 24/09/1949
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 16/07/1955
ALLOC BowesBridge   4w/e 30/11/1957
WDN   on 09/02/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
01/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted
03/1939 Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted
09/1945 Steam Brake fitted
09/1945 Westinghouse Brake removed
09/1945 Vacuum Ejector removed
12/1948 Saturated LNER Diagram 67 Boiler Fitted
03/1952 Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during December included:-Nos. 952, 1437, 1625/41, 2378, 2970 (the last 'C.7'), 3368, 5639, 5650 (badly damaged at Jervaulx), 5693, 5759/97, 5807, 7278, 7651, 8010/37, 8155, 8292, 9792, 9892, 60510, 62732/33, 65056, 67704/05/10/19/23, 69910/33, 'Austerity' 70877, 77414/69. Locomotives ex Works during December included:-Nos. 60918/42/70, 61432, 61601/29/30/51, 62344/65, 62728/31/54, 63352, 63423, 65033, 65856, 67283, 67342, 67636/39/87, 67701, 68016 (altered bunker), 68264/75, 68436, 68696, 68745, 69102, 69794, 69842/79/89, 'Austerity' 77329. Locomotives broken up: Nos. 2390 an 3327. The two Class 'V.2's' which have hitherto been used as main line pilots, have now been replaced by Class 'A.3' Nos. 70 an 76. SLS/194902
04/09/1954 York MPD A shortage of locomotive power at York shed on Saturday 4/9/54 was ingeniously met by the following interesting 'projections.' The Newcastle-Lowestoft train leaving York at 10.12 a.m. was worked to Lincoln by 45719 (27A), which re-appeared later in the day on the normal return working from that point. The Newcastle-Cardiff train leaving York at 10.0 a.m, was worked to Sheffield by 60162 (64B), ex-Doncaster Works, and the 9.10 a.m. York to Scarborough was worked by 44137 (21A); this latter, however, failed at Malton and was replaced by 43125 (50C). On the freight side the 8.40 a.m. Class D from York (Dringhouses) to Heaton was worked by 64213 (38A). A pleasing site at York on 5/10/54, in view of the present Diesel supremacy at Hull, was 69102 (53A) returning from Darlington Works to Hull after overhaul and repainting. SLS/195411

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1902 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1317
Built at Darlington Works
   
01/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
03/1939 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted    
09/1945 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
09/1945 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed    
09/1945 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
04/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9102    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
12/1948 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67 Boiler Fitted    
12/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 69102    
24/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
03/1952 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67A Boiler Fitted    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
14/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
02/1959 Scrapped Scrapped    
09/02/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 69102    

prev prev