Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 221 Today
» 997 Yesterday
» 3253 Week
» 21305 Month
» 254225 Year
» 1919601 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1699 m/e 03/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9105 m/e 09/1946
British Railways 69105 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class N10
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 03/1903
Withdrawal Fri 16/06/1961
Service Life 58 yrs, 3 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1903
GHD   Gateshead on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 25/09/1948
GHD   Gateshead w/e 12/02/1949
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 24/09/1949
54B   Tyne Dock 4w/e 23/12/1950
54B   Tyne Dock m/e 31/12/1950
52A   Gateshead w/e 02/05/1959
     Withdrawn on 16/06/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 25/09/1948
ALLOC GHD Gateshead w/e 12/02/1949
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 24/09/1949
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 52A Gateshead 4w/e 16/05/1959
WDN   on 16/06/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
12/1931 Vacuum Ejector fitted
02/1944 Vacuum Ejector removed
02/1944 Steam Brake fitted
02/1944 Westinghouse Brake removed
06/1952 Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during February included:-Nos. 1274, 1605/11/18/31/45, 2745/67, 3199, 3411, 5096, 5606/28, 5800, 7262, 8708, 9105, 60816, 60133, (adjustment), 61015 (damaged), 63140, 65057 (damaged in the Crook derailment), 65712, 67705/54, 69827 (NEA), Class '8' W.D. 77320 an 79239.To scrap yard: Nos. 3291/97/99, 3301/08/17/32, 63322 (badly damaged at Old Town Jct., Middlesboro').Locomotives ex Works during February included:-Nos. 60141, 60142 (Darlington 2061/1949-the first 1949 locomotive), 60143, 60509 (light repair), 60923, 60931 (light repair), 61022 (unlined black), 61161 (lined out), 61162 (unlined black), 61181/86, 61237/58, 61400, 61635/41, 61659 (light repair), 61660, 62353/59/78, 62718/32/64, 63341/49, 65098, 65601, 65633 (repaired at Gateshead-buffer beam snow plough fitted), 65712/49, 65827/60, 67255, 67386, 67623, 67714 (light repair), 68010/39, 68160, 68260, 69933, Class '8' W.D. 90252 (ex 77352), 90344 (ex 70877), 90613 (ex 77469). SLS/194904
09/07/1961 Darlington Works (Scrap Yard, ii Parts of Locos) Erecting Shop: D242, D2243/6/8, D2700, D3456, D4073-6, D5160-4, 60803/80/99, 61322, 61457, 63354, 63401/65, 65825, 77012, 78022, 80075, 90061, 90405/26, 92197. Stripping Shop: 61437. Stripping Shop Yard: 60882, 60935/71, 63367, 63417/66, 65760, 77011. Works Yard: D239/78/80, D5158, 43051, 43126/33/4/41, 46480, 60802/55, 60903/63, 63441, 65099, 65761/90, 65820/84, 67643/58, 67760, 68040/7/50, 90089, 92175. Crossing: D13, D4072, D5159. Stooperdale: 90074. Scrap Yard, (i) Complete Locos: 61432/45, 67665, 67707/19/32/8/40, DEPT54. Scrap Yard, (ii) Parts of Locos: 61455, 68080, 68316, 69105, 69921. SLS/196108

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1903 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1699
Built at Darlington Works
   
12/1931 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
02/1944 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
02/1944 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed    
02/1944 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
09/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9105    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
25/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
12/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (GHD)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69105    
24/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
06/1952 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted    
02/05/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
16/06/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 69105    
07/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev