Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 726 Today
» 779 Yesterday
» 4841 Week
» 12956 Month
» 140399 Year
» 1805775 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1707 m/e 03/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9106 m/e 11/1946
British Railways 69106 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class N10
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 03/1903
Withdrawal Mon 17/03/1958
Service Life 55 yrs , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1958

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1903
GHD   Gateshead on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 25/09/1948
54B   Tyne Dock 5w/e 23/07/1955
     Withdrawn on 17/03/1958

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 25/09/1948
ALLOC 54B Tyne Dock 4w/e 16/07/1955
WDN   on 17/03/1958

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
05/1930 Vacuum Ejector fitted
02/1944 Vacuum Ejector removed
02/1944 Steam Brake fitted
02/1944 Westinghouse Brake removed
05/1946 Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1949 Darlington Works New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. SLS/194907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1903 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1707
Built at Darlington Works
   
05/1930 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
02/1944 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
02/1944 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed    
02/1944 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
05/1946 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted    
11/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9106    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
25/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69106    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Tyne Dock (54B)    
17/03/1958 Withdrawn Condemned as 69106    
04/1958 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev