Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 801 Today
» 779 Yesterday
» 4916 Week
» 13031 Month
» 140474 Year
» 1805850 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North Eastern Railway 1711 m/e 03/1903
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9107 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 69107 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Worsdell
Class N10
Company History NER/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Darlington Works
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 03/1903
Withdrawal Fri 27/12/1957
Service Life 54 yrs, 9 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1958

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1903
GHD   Gateshead on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
HLD   Hull Dairycoates w/e 24/09/1949
     Withdrawn on 27/12/1957

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC HLD Hull Dairycoates w/e 24/09/1949
WDN   on 27/12/1957

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1929 Vacuum Ejector fitted
03/1939 Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted
04/1946 Steam Brake fitted
04/1946 Westinghouse Brake removed
04/1946 Vacuum Ejector removed


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/03/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. SLS/194905
30/04/1949 Darlington Works New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84.
Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460.
SLS/194906

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1903 To Service To service as North Eastern Railway Number 1711
Built at Darlington Works
   
02/1929 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
03/1939 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 67B Boiler Fitted    
04/1946 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
04/1946 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector removed    
04/1946 Modification Modification: Westinghouse Brake removed    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9107    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Gateshead (GHD)    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 69107    
24/09/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD)    
27/12/1957 Withdrawn Condemned as 69107    
01/1958 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev