Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 56 Today
» 904 Yesterday
» 5587 Week
» 7325 Month
» 134768 Year
» 1800144 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Hull & Barnsley Railway 105 m/e 12/1901
North Eastern Railway 3105 y/e 1923
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 2486 m/e 04/1924
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9089 m/e 12/1946
British Railways 69089 m/e Not applied

Locomotive Specifics
Designer M. Stirling
Class N12
Company History HBR/LNER
Rebuild History
ClassFrom
N1212/1901
Wheels 0-6-2T
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 4073
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Vacuum
To Service During 12/1901
Withdrawal Mon 30/08/1948 off Hull Springhead (HLS)
Service Life 46 yrs , 9 mths

Disposal

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1901
HLS   Hull Springhead on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
     Withdrawn on 30/08/1948

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN HLS Hull Springhead on 30/08/1948

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1924 Steam Brake fitted
04/1924 Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted
04/1924 Vacuum Brakes removed
08/1934 LNER Diagram 71B Boiler Fitted


Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1948 Extinct classes Classes 'F.7', 'J.60', 'L.2', 'M.2' and 'N.12' became extinct by the withdrawal of the following engines: Nos. 7093/94 on 8/11; 8368 on 3/8; 9070 on 22/10; 9076/77 on 22/10; 9089 on 30/8. SLS/194901
31/08/1948 Darlington Works Locomotives for shops during August included Nos. 507, 980, 2366, 3285, 3349, 3426/69, 5641, 5872, 7282, 7344, 7628, 8424, 8712/32, 9089, 9787, 62762, 67281 an 69798. Locomotives ex shops during the same period included Nos. 60509, 60824/25/98, 60920, 61455/61, 62706, 63361, 63418, 65647/69/92, 65708/37/41/62/63/67/89/99, 65809/16/62, 67295, 67605/16/30/78, 68305/37/60/93, 68423, 69781/82/95, 69868/73/84. No. 61461 has been rebuilt to 'B.16/3'; Paint date, August. Locomotives painted black and fully lined are Nos. 60898, 60920 an 62706, while No. 60509 has been painted green. The last 'L.1', No. 67730, is Darlington 2048 of 1948; Paint date, August SLS/194810
03/10/1948 Darlington Works The first new 'A.1,' No. 60130, was on trial W/E 24/9 and No. 60131 during W/E 2/10, both are nameless. Locomotives awaiting Works:-Nos. 517, 2342/71, 3344, 5027/28, 5852/83, 7300/07, 8141, E8723, 9392, 9881, 61638, 63099, 69841 and Electric 26500. Locomotives ex Works:-Nos. 60804, 60980, 62729/75, 63333/91, 65666/92, 65752, 68302/99, 68675, 68744, 69868 and 'Austerity' 77050. No. 9089 was broken up W/E 24/9. SLS/194811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1901 To Service To service as Hull & Barnsley Railway Number 105    
1923 Renumbered Renumbered to 3105    
04/1924 Modification Modification: Saturated LNER Diagram 81 Boiler Fitted    
04/1924 Modification Modification: Steam Brake fitted    
04/1924 Modification Modification: Vacuum Brakes removed    
04/1924 Renumbered Renumbered to 2486    
08/1934 Modification Modification: LNER Diagram 71B Boiler Fitted    
12/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9089    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Hull Springhead (HLS)    
30/08/1948 Withdrawn Condemned as 9089 from Hull Springhead (HLS)    
1949 Number Allocated Allocated number 69089 but not taken up    

prev prev