Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 303 Today
» 957 Yesterday
» 4280 Week
» 15517 Month
» 248437 Year
» 1913813 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
North British Railway 863 m/e 09/1909
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) 9863 m/e 02/1925
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 9125 m/e 10/1946
British Railways 69125 m/e 04/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Reid
Class N14
Company History NBR/LNER
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L345
Works Number 18867
Fittings (as built)
Engine Brakes Westinghouse
To Service During 09/1909
Withdrawal Thu 25/03/1954 off Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)
Service Life 44 yrs, 6 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During y/e 1954

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1909
KIT   Kittybrewster on 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
61B   Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 23/12/1950
61B   Aberdeen Ferryhill m/e 31/12/1950
     Withdrawn on 25/03/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill m/e 31/12/1950
WDN   on 25/03/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified Modification
02/1925 Vacuum Ejector fitted


Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1909 To Service To service as North British Railway Number 863
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 18867
   
02/1925 Modification Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted    
02/1925 Renumbered Renumbered to 9863    
10/1946 Renumbered Renumbered to 9125    
01/01/1948 Allocation Allocation Snapshot - Kittybrewster (KIT)    
04/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 69125    
23/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
1954 Scrapped Scrapped    
25/03/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 69125 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    

prev