Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 763 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14169 Week
» 67185 Month
» 186712 Year
» 3213565 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
154 |
m/e |
06/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9154 |
m/e |
11/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9127 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
69127 |
m/e |
01/1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Modifications
Date Modified |
Modification |
11/1925 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
10/1953 |
Steam Brakes fitted |
10/1953 |
Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
06/1910 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 154 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19160 |
|
|
11/1925 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
11/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9154 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9127 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
01/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69127 |
|
|
10/1953 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam Brakes fitted |
|
|
10/1953 |
Modification |
Modification: Vacuum Ejector fitted |
|
|
31/08/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B) |
|
|
10/05/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
16/06/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69127 from Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
09/1959 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|