Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 614 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18417 Week
» 71433 Month
» 190960 Year
» 3217813 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
391 |
m/e |
07/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9391 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9137 |
m/e |
05/1946 |
British Railways |
69137 |
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1910 |
POL |
|
Polmont |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
21/05/1962 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
21/05/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
03/06/1962 |
Stored at Boness |
Stored at Boness on the 3rd June were 40154/8/9/177/200, 57245/85/314/38/66/470, 57576, 62031/52, 62496, 62691/3, 64472/7/514/5/8/32/5, 65230/80, 67611/4/9/22/5/6/32/50/5/76, 68119/448/54/72/9, 69014/126/31/7/63/81/3/91 an 90436. |
SLS/196207 |
12/07/1962 |
Inverurie Works (Condemned) |
In Shops: 42832, 55173, 57451, 64533/62, 64613/4/9, 65920. Awaiting Shops: 44016, D6142/4/7. Shopped during four weeks ending 30th June : 64537/47/79, 64606/25, 65297, 65319, D362, D2410, D5314, D6148/54, D8032. Condemned during four weeks ending 30th June: 40614, 55232, 64533/78, 65266/80, 65318/30, 69137. |
SLS/196208 |
02/08/1962 |
Polmont MPD |
In store on 2nd August-40188/9/200, 64795, 67618/29/30/43/62/78, 69188/212/8. 65280 an 69137 were removed during July to Inverurie for scrap. 69126 an 68454/72 were en route Boness dump-Clarkston for scrap on 31st July. |
SLS/196209 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1910 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 391 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19170 |
|
|
08/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9391 |
|
|
05/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9137 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Polmont (POL) |
|
|
06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69137 |
|
|
21/05/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69137 from Polmont (65K) |
|
|
07/1962 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |
|
|