Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1446 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19249 Week
» 72265 Month
» 191792 Year
» 3218645 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
393 |
m/e |
07/1910 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9393 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9139 |
on |
10/02/1946 |
British Railways |
69139 |
m/e |
10/1948 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1910 |
CAR |
|
Carlisle Canal |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
26/04/1958 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
26/04/1958 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
28/02/1950 |
Cowlairs Works |
Locomotives entering Works during February: These included Nos. 61002/64, 61350, 61742/43/57/58, 1760, 61792, 61851, 61996/98, 62215, 2431/89, 62719, 4556, 64589, 4597/99, 64613, 4922, 5903, 65926, 67455, 67605, 8956, 69139, 69203/08, 69500/96, ex-W.D. 73789. 90755/66. |
SLS/195004 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1910 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 393 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 19172 |
|
|
12/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9393 |
|
|
10/02/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9139 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Carlisle Canal (CAR) |
|
|
10/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69139 |
|
|
26/04/1958 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69139 from Carlisle Canal (68E) |
|
|
07/1958 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Kilmarnock |
|
|