|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
09/07/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works 6/6 to 9/7: These included Nos. 1221, 61245, 61308, 1726/32, 61772/89, 61936, 2461/81/90, 2689, 62692, 63177, 4541, 64567, 4591, 64625, 4706, 64790, 4864, 64915, 5925/31, 67475/78, 8120, 8338/40, 68499, 8551, 9129/32, 69144, 9157/66/92, 70802, 77442, ex L.M.S. Nos. 45086, 7162, 54651. During June, locomotives were still being turned out lettered 'British Railways' from this Works. | SLS/194908 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
05/1913 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 229 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 20167 |
||
09/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9229 | ||
11/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9166 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) | ||
07/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69166 | ||
25/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Parkhead (65C) | ||
07/12/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69166 from Parkhead (65C) | ||
01/1960 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |