|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
30/11/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during November: These included Nos. 60501/05, 61002, 1293, 61701/49/86/88, 61857, 61909, 2422, 62426, 62706, 3049, 3126, 4548/90, 4615/16, 4706, 64794, 4842, 4923/41, 5902, 65907, 5909/12/26, 7477, 67608, 8121, 8445, 8503, 8952, 9143/76/88, 69199, 9205, 90004, 73798, 77342/71. | SLS/195001 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/1916 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 69 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21222 |
||
03/1925 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9069 | ||
08/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9176 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) | ||
12/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69176 | ||
25/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) | ||
30/11/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) | ||
12/08/1959 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69176 from Dawsholm (65D) | ||
09/1959 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Inverurie |