Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 857 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18660 Week
» 71676 Month
» 191203 Year
» 3218056 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
70 |
m/e |
12/1916 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9070 |
m/e |
08/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9177 |
m/e |
11/1946 |
British Railways |
69177 |
m/e |
08/1949 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65D |
Dawsholm |
m/e |
30/11/1950 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
09/08/1960 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
24/08/1947 |
Eastfield MPD |
On 24/8 the locos. on shed ex works were 'J39' 4923/33; 'J83' 8445 and 'J69' 8623, and further locos. ex works during August that have been noted here are: 'K2' 1757; 'J37' 4541/79/84, 4604/17/21; 'J39' 4711, 4818, 4929; 'C15' 7468; 'J88' 8345; 'J83' 8473 (green); 'N15' 9136/77 an 9222. |
SLS/194710 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
12/1916 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 70 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 21223 |
|
|
08/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9070 |
|
|
11/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9177 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) |
|
|
08/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69177 |
|
|
25/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
30/11/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
09/08/1960 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69177 from Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
10/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |
|
|