|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/06/1948 | Cowlairs Works (yard) | Locomotives in the yard awaiting repair were Nos. 502, 1745, 2436/39, 4532, 4600, 4791, 5237, 5913, 8118, 8350, 8955, 9178, 9503/11, 61002 an 61735-the last two being lettered B.R. Locomotives in the Works were: Stripping Pit Nos. 1102, 9927; Erecting Shop Nos. 1116, 1774/75/77/92/94, 1885, 1916/95, 2686/90, 4524/50/60/89, 4821, 7492, 8567, 9126/45, 61767; Steaming Pits Nos. 1787, 4925, 61134, 61292, 69206; Paint Shop Nos. 1101, 1783. 61292 is fitted with ex L.M.S. tablet catcher and is to be used on Perth-Inverness trials. | SLS/194808 |
05/09/1953 | Unusual chimneys | Two unique happenings have been (a) the fitting of J36 (NB) chimney to L.M.S. 0-4-4T 55210 and (b) the fitting of 69178 N15 with a stovepipe chimney. | SLS/195312 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/1923 | To Service | To service as North British Railway Number 71 Built at Cowlairs Works |
||
12/1926 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9071 | ||
05/1946 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 9178 | ||
01/01/1948 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Eastfield (EFD) | ||
06/1948 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 69178 | ||
01/07/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
26/08/1961 | Allocation | Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) | ||
22/12/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) | ||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 69178 from Motherwell (66B) | ||
10/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |