Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3150 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16556 Week
» 69572 Month
» 189099 Year
» 3215952 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
60 |
m/e |
11/1923 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9060 |
m/e |
03/1926 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9211 |
on |
24/03/1946 |
British Railways |
69211 |
m/e |
09/1948 |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
TOSTORE |
|
|
4w/e |
09/08/1958 |
ALLOC |
64B |
Haymarket |
4w/e |
14/03/1959 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
01/10/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
05/05/1962 |
Bathgate MPD |
Stored are-60099/160. 60813/8/9/24/92. 60920/7/31/7/53/8, 62685. 64497, 64500, 65235/58/68/305, 67615/20, 68335/42/481, 69156/9/211/6. |
SLS/196206 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/1923 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 60 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
03/1926 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9060 |
|
|
24/03/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9211 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Thornton Junction (THJ) |
|
|
09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69211 |
|
|
14/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
01/10/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69211 from Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
06/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by P.W. McLellan: Coatbridge |
|
|