Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 18 Online
» 1599 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19402 Week
» 72418 Month
» 191945 Year
» 3218798 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
North British Railway |
78 |
m/e |
02/1924 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1924) |
9078 |
m/e |
12/1925 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
9217 |
m/e |
06/1946 |
British Railways |
69217 |
m/e |
03/1951 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
02/1924 |
PKD |
|
Parkhead |
on |
01/01/1948 (Snapshot) |
65D |
|
Dawsholm |
4w/e |
06/07/1957 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
16/10/1959 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
65D |
Dawsholm |
4w/e |
13/07/1957 |
WDN |
|
|
on |
16/10/1959 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1924 |
To Service |
To service as North British Railway Number 78 Built at Cowlairs Works |
|
|
12/1925 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9078 |
|
|
06/1946 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 9217 |
|
|
01/01/1948 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Parkhead (PKD) |
|
|
03/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 69217 |
|
|
06/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
16/10/1959 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 69217 from Dawsholm (65D) |
|
|
02/1960 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs |
|
|