|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 20/03/1923 | 16/07/1923 | 119 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/09/1923 | 06/10/1923 | 10 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/03/1925 | 04/07/1925 | 100 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3477 |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/05/1927 | 26/08/1927 | 92 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/08/1927 | 21/12/1927 | 117 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1929 | 21/12/1929 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/11/1931 | 19/12/1931 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/03/1934 | 31/03/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7707 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 25/01/1936 | 15/02/1936 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/06/1936 | 04/07/1936 | 29 days | Heavy | |||
Doncaster Works | 25/06/1938 | 16/07/1938 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 7713 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 18/05/1940 | 15/06/1940 | 29 days | General | SW cab fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 16/05/1942 | 20/06/1942 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8819 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/04/1944 | 10/05/1944 | 19 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/03/1946 | 10/07/1947 | 475 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3922 |
||
Doncaster Works | 09/11/1949 | 02/12/1949 | 24 days | General | Boiler number 9366 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63922 |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/07/1951 | 03/08/1951 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 21031 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 28/03/1954 | 26/04/1954 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 21042 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/06/1956 | 26/07/1956 | 44 days | General | Boiler number 21024 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1958 | 29/11/1958 | 39 days | General | Boiler number 21023 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 12/08/1959 | 21/08/1959 | 10 days | Unclassified | |||
Doncaster Works | 08/08/1961 | 19/09/1961 | 43 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/11/1962 | 02/11/1962 | 1 day | No repairs |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
01/10/1961 | Doncaster MPD (36A) | Ex-Works on Doncaster (36A) Shed : D2398, D3446, 60059, 60132, 61098, 61196, 63922. | SLS/196111 |
29/10/1961 | Doncaster MPD (36A) (Ex-Works on shed) | Ex-Works on shed: D5818/9 new, 43062, 60012/50/92, 61361, 63922, 62040; also 61444 ex-Darlington Works. | SLS/196112 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 477 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22691 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
20/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/03/1923. Dep: 16/07/1923. | ||
27/09/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/09/1923. Dep: 06/10/1923. | ||
27/03/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/03/1925. Dep: 04/07/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3477 |
||
27/05/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1927. Dep: 26/08/1927. | ||
27/08/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 27/08/1927. Dep: 21/12/1927. | ||
09/11/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1929. Dep: 21/12/1929. | ||
07/11/1931 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/11/1931. Dep: 19/12/1931. | ||
03/03/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/03/1934. Dep: 31/03/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7707 (Diagram 2) |
||
25/01/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/01/1936. Dep: 15/02/1936. | ||
06/06/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Heavy) - Arr: 06/06/1936. Dep: 04/07/1936. | ||
25/06/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 25/06/1938. Dep: 16/07/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7713 (Diagram 2) |
||
21/12/1939 | Modification | Diagram 2 number 7520 boiler fitted | ||
18/05/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 18/05/1940. Dep: 15/06/1940. Work undertaken: SW cab fitted |
||
16/05/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 16/05/1942. Dep: 20/06/1942. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8819 (Diagram 2) |
||
14/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
22/04/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/04/1944. Dep: 10/05/1944. | ||
24/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
09/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
23/03/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 23/03/1946. Dep: 10/07/1947. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3922 |
||
20/10/1947 | Allocation | Reallocated to Frodingham (FRO) | ||
09/11/1949 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/11/1949. Dep: 02/12/1949. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9366 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63922 |
||
05/07/1951 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/07/1951. Dep: 03/08/1951. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21031 (Diagram 2) |
||
28/03/1954 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 28/03/1954. Dep: 26/04/1954. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21042 (Diagram 2) |
||
13/06/1954 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) | ||
13/06/1956 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/06/1956. Dep: 26/07/1956. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21024 (Diagram 2) |
||
22/10/1958 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1958. Dep: 29/11/1958. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21023 (Diagram 2) |
||
12/08/1959 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 12/08/1959. Dep: 21/08/1959. | ||
08/08/1961 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 08/08/1961. Dep: 19/09/1961. | ||
29/07/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (34F) | ||
11/1962 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster | ||
02/11/1962 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (No repairs) - Arr: 02/11/1962. Dep: 02/11/1962. | ||
05/11/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63922 from Grantham (34F) |