|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Works | Stopped | Entry | Departure | Duration | Level of Work | Actual | Mileage |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Doncaster Works | 21/03/1923 | 09/07/1923 | 111 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 02/09/1925 | 21/11/1925 | 81 days | General | Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3478 |
||
Doncaster Works | 03/12/1927 | 03/03/1928 | 92 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 14/12/1929 | 18/01/1930 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 7518 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 20/02/1932 | 26/03/1932 | 36 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 07/04/1934 | 05/05/1934 | 29 days | General | Boiler number 7712 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 04/04/1936 | 02/05/1936 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 23/05/1936 | 30/05/1936 | 8 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 09/07/1938 | 13/08/1938 | 36 days | General | Boiler number 8975 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/06/1940 | 13/07/1940 | 22 days | General | SW cab fitted |
||
Doncaster Works | 05/09/1942 | 03/10/1942 | 29 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 06/11/1943 | 20/11/1943 | 15 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 27/05/1944 | 17/06/1944 | 22 days | General | |||
Doncaster Works | 05/01/1946 | 26/01/1946 | 22 days | Light Repair | |||
Doncaster Works | 03/08/1946 | 24/08/1946 | 22 days | General | Boiler number 8859 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3923 |
||
Doncaster Works | 01/08/1948 | 01/09/1948 | 32 days | General | Boiler number 9239 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63923 |
||
Doncaster Works | 22/10/1950 | 17/11/1950 | 27 days | General | Boiler number 21006 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 10/03/1953 | 08/04/1953 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 21065 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 19/01/1955 | 17/02/1955 | 30 days | General | Boiler number 21054 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 27/11/1957 | 21/12/1957 | 25 days | General | Boiler number 21011 (Diagram 2) |
||
Doncaster Works | 13/07/1960 | 12/08/1960 | 31 days | General | Boiler number 21030 (Diagram 2) |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
19/12/1960 | Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop Yard) | New Erecting Shop: E3057-63, D3329, 12125, and frames for three new diesel shunters. Stripping Road: 60113, 60507/10/32, 61083, 61141/51, 73074. Scrap Road: 61771, 62666, 63950/3, 641S2,48875 68943/7, 69293, 69581. Erecting Shop: 43148, 60004/15/25/74/86, 60109, 60539, 61044, 61177, 61314, 61807, 73097, D3475/86, D8020. Erecting Shop Yard: 60058/66, 60144/5, 61266/85, 63923, D3487. Crimpsall Yard: 63944, 68911/4. Paint Shop: 60006, 60531. 61279, 61366, 61862, 62022/56, 63935, D312, D2113, D2207, D5675-7, E3056. | SLS/196102 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
04/1921 | To Service | To service as Great Northern Railway Number 478 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 22692 Allocated to New England (NWE) Diagram 2 boiler fitted |
||
21/03/1923 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 21/03/1923. Dep: 09/07/1923. | ||
02/09/1925 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 02/09/1925. Dep: 21/11/1925. Work undertaken: Renumbered to LNER (1924) number 3478 |
||
03/12/1927 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/12/1927. Dep: 03/03/1928. | ||
14/12/1929 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 14/12/1929. Dep: 18/01/1930. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7518 (Diagram 2) |
||
20/02/1932 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 20/02/1932. Dep: 26/03/1932. | ||
07/04/1934 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 07/04/1934. Dep: 05/05/1934. Work undertaken: Boiler number 7712 (Diagram 2) |
||
04/04/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 04/04/1936. Dep: 02/05/1936. | ||
23/05/1936 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 23/05/1936. Dep: 30/05/1936. | ||
09/07/1938 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 09/07/1938. Dep: 13/08/1938. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8975 (Diagram 2) |
||
22/06/1940 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/06/1940. Dep: 13/07/1940. Work undertaken: SW cab fitted |
||
05/09/1942 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 05/09/1942. Dep: 03/10/1942. | ||
12/05/1943 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
06/11/1943 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 06/11/1943. Dep: 20/11/1943. | ||
23/01/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
27/05/1944 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/05/1944. Dep: 17/06/1944. | ||
24/12/1944 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (NWE) | ||
25/06/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) | ||
09/12/1945 | Allocation | Reallocated to Doncaster (DON) | ||
05/01/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (Light Repair) - Arr: 05/01/1946. Dep: 26/01/1946. | ||
03/08/1946 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 03/08/1946. Dep: 24/08/1946. Work undertaken: Boiler number 8859 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to LNER (1946) number 3923 |
||
27/10/1946 | Allocation | Reallocated to Langwith Junction (LNG) | ||
01/08/1948 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 01/08/1948. Dep: 01/09/1948. Work undertaken: Boiler number 9239 (Diagram 2) Renumbered to BR 63923 |
||
18/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
30/06/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
20/08/1950 | Allocation | Reallocated to New England (35A) | ||
22/10/1950 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 22/10/1950. Dep: 17/11/1950. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21006 (Diagram 2) |
||
11/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Grantham (35B) | ||
10/03/1953 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 10/03/1953. Dep: 08/04/1953. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21065 (Diagram 2) |
||
19/01/1955 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 19/01/1955. Dep: 17/02/1955. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21054 (Diagram 2) |
||
27/11/1957 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 27/11/1957. Dep: 21/12/1957. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21011 (Diagram 2) |
||
13/07/1960 | Works Visit | Works Visit - Doncaster Works (General) - Arr: 13/07/1960. Dep: 12/08/1960. Work undertaken: Boiler number 21030 (Diagram 2) |
||
29/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 63923 from Grantham (34F) | ||
12/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |